HSBC: Registration of Management Board Members in charge of Depository Operations
Date update 18/01/2016 - 17:03:45
On 13th January 2016, Vietnam Securities Depository (VSD) received document no. 07-2016/HSS-HSBC dated 12th January 2016 of HSBC Bank (Vietnam) Ltd. registering the List of Management Board Members in charge of Depository Operations. Details are as follows:
Mr. Vinith Rao will leave the position of Head of Securities Services of HSBC Vietnam from 8th January 2016 and Ms. Phan Thi Huynh Dao is appointed to the above position from 11th January 2016
Mr. Vinith Rao will leave the position of Head of Securities Services of HSBC Vietnam from 8th January 2016 and Ms. Phan Thi Huynh Dao is appointed to the above position from 11th January 2016
Issuer's news
-
HSBC: Replacement of the Management Board in charge of depository operations
Date update 11/09/2024 - 15:40:09 -
HSBC: Replacement of the Management Board in charge of depository operations
Date update 27/05/2024 - 17:15:06 -
HSBC: Issuance of Revised Depository Member Certificate
Date update 07/04/2021 - 10:56:09 -
HSBC: Supplementation of Management Board Member Being in Charge of Depository Operations
Date update 01/04/2020 - 14:41:47 -
HSBC: Issuance of Revised Membership Certificate
Date update 04/10/2019 - 16:24:37 -
HSBC: Issuance of Revised Membership Certificate
Date update 04/04/2019 - 14:59:56 -
HSBC: Issuance of Revised Membership Certificate
Date update 29/01/2015 - 11:18:00 -
HSBC:Issuance of Revised Membership Certificate
Date update 05/12/2014 - 00:00:00 -
HSBC:Issuance of Membership Certificate
Date update 19/03/2014 - 00:00:00 -
HSBC:Issuance of Revised Membership Certificate
Date update 10/08/2012 - 00:00:00
Others news
-
DNSE: Addition of the Management Board Member being in Charge of Depository Operations
Date update 17/09/2024 - 15:29:47 -
FNS: Adding Member of the Management Board being in charge of Depository Activities
Date update 13/09/2024 - 13:51:12 -
HSBC: Replacement of the Management Board in charge of depository operations
Date update 11/09/2024 - 15:40:09 -
ASB: Registration of Management Board members being in charge of depository operations
Date update 09/09/2024 - 14:06:11 -
SSV: Addition of Management Board Member being in Charge of Depository Operations
Date update 12/08/2024 - 16:51:02 -
PSI: Change of Management Board Member Being in Charge of Depository Operations
Date update 31/07/2024 - 13:52:32 -
VTSS: Change of Management Board Member Being in Charge of Depository Operations
Date update 24/07/2024 - 14:37:52 -
MSVN: Change of Management Board Member Being in Charge of Depository Operations
Date update 23/07/2024 - 15:15:58 -
APG: Change of of the Management Board Member Being in Charge of Depository Operations
Date update 16/07/2024 - 14:26:12 -
SHS: Registration of the List of Management Board being in charge of Depository operations
Date update 03/06/2024 - 16:04:48
Hot news
-
18/09/2024 - 15:28:54
BID12434: Issuance of the Initial Bond Registration Certificate
-
18/09/2024 - 15:28:18
BID12435: Issuance of the Initial Bond Registration Certificate
-
17/09/2024 - 15:12:55
VSDC attended the 26th General Meeting of the Asia - Pacific CSD Group
-
13/09/2024 - 15:38:31
VPB: Transfer of ownership for 162,907 shares
-
13/09/2024 - 13:41:54
AIG: Issuance of the Initial Securities Registration Certificate
-
13/09/2024 - 11:07:57
NAB12405: Issuance of the Initial Bond Registration Certificate
-
13/09/2024 - 11:06:34
OCB12416: Issuance of the Initial Bond Registration Certificate
-
04/09/2024 - 16:28:19
CTG12412: Issuance of the Initial Bond Registration Certificate
-
04/09/2024 - 16:27:38
BCM12403: Issuance of the Initial Bond Registration Certificate
-
23/08/2024 - 10:36:44
MBB: Transfer of Ownership for 10,599,512 shares
Statistics
-
42,377|5,963
-
6
-
3,014
-
786
-
37
-
8,706,229